FATHER HUDSON'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 512992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download