FATHER HUDSON'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 512992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.34m £7.31m £6.99m £8.54m £7.72m
Total expenditure £6.93m £7.34m £7.47m £7.80m £7.92m
Income from government contracts £3.36m £3.56m £3.42m £3.75m £3.86m
Income from government grants £15.33k £0 £410.26k £207.03k £311.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £691.29k £899.79k £770.17k £778.12k £592.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.37m £5.75m £5.96m £6.66m £6.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £205.26k £202.80k £202.08k £274.50k £228.54k
Income - Other £79.26k £463.08k £63.07k £823.13k £174.60k
Income - Legacies £78.45k £321.16k £198.68k £234.42k £5.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.62m £7.03m £7.09m £7.58m £7.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £215.90k £234.19k £232.55k £224.20k £245.54k
Expenditure - Governance £94.58k £51.67k £175.03k £114.31k £117.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £1.25k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £17.34k £18.12k £0
Expenditure - Other £94.70k £71.94k £146.47k £0 £0