FATHER HUDSON'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 512992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GAIL BROWN Trustee 28 February 2013 None on record
ANNE VERONICA PLUMMER Trustee None on record
David Peter Bellew Craig Trustee 18 June 2019 None on record
Brendan Martin Clifford Trustee 26 June 2018 None on record
Rev MICHAEL DARREN GAMBLE Trustee 07 June 2012 None on record
BRIAN PETER BASFORD Trustee
ST MARY'S COLLEGE OSCOTT CIO Received: On time
IYEREKHU ST PAUL'S MISSION SCHOOL Received: On time
Jane Patricia Wilton Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
PETER ANTHONY WILLIAM DEELEY Trustee 12 July 2016
COVENTRY BUILDING EMPLOYERS' CHARITY Received: On time
JULIA ANGELA FITZSIMONS Trustee 28 February 2013 None on record
REV KEVIN MICHAEL KAVANAGH Trustee 28 February 2013 None on record
JESSICA MOORE Trustee None on record
KEVIN PATRICK CAFFREY Trustee 16 December 2011 None on record
Mary Elizabeth Fionnuala Hegarty Trustee 12 July 2016 None on record
Peter Fahy Trustee 20 April 2020 None on record