SAFE IN OUR WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Safe In Our World works within the video games industry to promote mental health awareness and eliminate stigma surrounding mental health, making it a natural topic of conversation. Safe In Our World is a hub for information, news, features, videos, and support for everyone within the gaming industry and beyond. We promote this message through initiatives such as the #LevelUp campaign.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONARDO ZULLO | Chair | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Erla Arnadottir | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Callum Underwood | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Reay | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Harman | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Boucher | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Parker Adcock | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Paul Murphy | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL DAVID BROADHEAD | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARETH WILLIAM BRETT WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.98k | £346.42k | £128.02k | £303.16k | £250.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.32k | £82.37k | £176.97k | £314.78k | £195.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 May 2019 as amended on 18 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
The object of the CIO is: For the public benefit the promotion and protection of good mental health of people in the video game industry, as well as those who play video games or engage through watching video game content, in particular but not exclusively through the provision of training, research, support resources, video game content and information about relevant mental health services.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAFE IN OUR WORLD
A Infantino A & Co Llp
87-89 High Street
HODDESDON
EN11 8TL
- Phone:
- 07973741745
- Email:
- hello@safeinourworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window