SAMARITAN FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing or assisting in the provision of food, water and other essentials, healthcare products, education about nutrition programmes, and all the necessary support designed to enable individuals to generate a sustainable income and be self-suffient. Engaging communities to grow their own food. Helping families develop safe hygiene practices to prevent diseases like cholera.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 May 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY NADDAMBA | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
IVAN RUKUNDO OCHIENGHS | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MULASA | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/05/2020 | 20/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £2.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.72k | £3.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days | |
Annual return | 20 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days | |
Annual return | 20 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 775 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 775 days | |
Annual return | 20 May 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 May 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN EASTERN AFRICA AND THE UK BY:- A) IN EASTERN AFRICA: I. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FOOD WATER AND OTHER ESSENTIALS, HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS, EDUCATION ABOUT NUTRITION PROGRAMMES, AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. II. ENGAGING COMMUNITIES TO GROW THEIR OWN FOOD III. HELPING FAMILIES DEVELOP SAFE HYGIENE PRACTICES TO PREVENT DISEASES LIKE CHOLERA IV. EMPOWERING WOMEN IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO BE SELF-RELIANT IN ORDER TO PROVIDE FOR THEMSELVES AND THEIR FAMILIES FOR EXAMPLE TRAINING PROGRAMMES LIKE KNITTING, SEWING, MODERN FARMING SKILLS INCLUDING LITERACY AND NUMERACY SKILLS. B) IN THE UK INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) TOTTENHAM NORTHUMBERLAND PARK: PROVISION OF FOOD BANKS, SOUP KITCHENS, COOKING LESSONS AND SIGNPOSTING TO HOUSING, DEPARTMENT FOR WORK AND PENSIONS AND SIMILAR AGENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 ROTHBURY WALK
LONDON
N17 0PQ
- Phone:
- 07871957540
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window