Trustees NATIONAL OCEANOGRAPHY CENTRE
Charity number: 1185265

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jeremy Darroch | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Ian Lamont Boyd | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||
DR RUTH SUSAN BOUMPHREY | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MICHELLE MCMATH | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL JAMES HOOK | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE KENNY | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN GEE | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.