Accounts and annual returns CARMARTHEN LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1180192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 05 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 14 June 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 26 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window