DOORWAYS DERBY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support to the homeless and vulnerable in Derby. We do this by supplying them with food parcels, sandwich packs, hot meals, clothes, sleeping bags, toiletries and other items as needed. We currently operate from two large purpose fitted vans three evenings a week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People
6 Trustee(s)
67 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRAIG WHEATLEY | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BODDINGTON | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
DAWN HURST | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
NIGEL GROOM | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADNAN AKHTAR | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISA WHEATLEY | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.96k | £36.34k | £22.13k | £33.58k | £75.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.47k | £21.85k | £17.11k | £27.61k | £63.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AGED 16 AND ABOVE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
142 OSMASTON PARK ROAD
DERBY
DE24 8EY
- Phone:
- 07754128763
- Email:
- doorways2015@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window