Accounts and annual returns KING’S FRIENDS

Charity number: 1180184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 March 2021 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required