TEN THOUSAND GOOD REASONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty within the UK those whom are lacking financial and/or material resources, by grants of money, interest free loans of money, the provision of items, payment of services or provision of facilities. The advancement of religion within the UK and worldwide by raising awareness and understanding of religious beliefs and practices, carrying out devotional acts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- India
- Israel
- Nepal
Governance
- 31 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS S LEWIS | Chair | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR D LEWIS | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MS M LEWIS | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.28k | £24.70k | £34.69k | £30.16k | £41.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.50k | £23.83k | £33.35k | £26.26k | £40.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY WITHIN THE UK BY PROVIDING GRANTS OF MONEY, INTEREST FREE LOANS OF MONEY, ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN THE UK AND OUTSIDE THE UK WORLDWIDE BY RAISING AWARENESS & UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS & PRACTICES, CARRYING OUT RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS, CARRYING OUT AND/OR SUPPORTING OR CONTRIBUTING FINANCIALLY TOWARDS MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Oakley Road
BORDON
Hampshire
GU35 0JG
- Phone:
- 07773310691
- Email:
- contactus.ttgr@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window