Trustees CATHOLIC CARE (DIOCESE OF LEEDS)

Charity number: 513063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Right Reverend Marcus Stock Chair 13 November 2014
LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
CATHOLIC EDUCATION SERVICE
Overdue by 113 days
Rev Martin Edward Kelly Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Kevin Joseph John Devers Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
VIVIENNE BIRCH Trustee 11 June 2018
None on record
MAUREEN FLETCHER Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record
Rev. Dr. Joseph Domenic Cortis Trustee 01 December 2015
LEEDS FAITHS FORUM
Received: On time
LEEDS CHURCH INSTITUTE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Susan Mary Christine Rix Trustee 25 November 2014
LEEDS TRINITY UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
MENSTON MEMORIAL COTTAGE CHARITY
Received: On time
MONSIGNOR DONAL LUCEY Trustee
HOUSE OF LIGHT TRUST (LEEDS) LIMITED
Received: On time
MONSIGNOR PETER ROSSER Trustee
WEST YORKSHIRE COMMUNITY CHAPLAINCY PROJECT
Received: On time
GROWING OLD GRACE-FULLY
Received: On time
TIMOTHY FRANCIS XAVIER PARR Trustee
THE INVIGORATE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time