Accounts and annual returns THE ANDY BIDDLE YOUTH SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1182935
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 January 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 26 January 2022 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window