MALTON, NORTON AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1180587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 11 November 2019 On time Download