Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST BOTOLPHS SCHOOL PETERBOROUGH

Charity number: 1182533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required