Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL INITIATIVE FOR THEORETICAL ECOLOGY

Charity number: 1183900
Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 55 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 55 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 09 May 2023 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 09 May 2023 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window