The Azure Charitable Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Azure operates Supported Businesses to provide salaried jobs and training for disabled people. It assists individuals in supported employment in organisations across the region. Personal development whether or not linked to qualifications or job outcomes is a key goal. We are committed to enabling disabled people to live as independently as possible. Community access support is also provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£9,221,693
Donations and legacies | £21.68k | |
Charitable activities | £5.12m | |
Other trading activities | £4.08m | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,615,407
Raising funds | £3.51m | |
Charitable activities | £5.11m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,582,493 from 8 government contract(s) and £167,739 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.51m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.11m | |
Retained for future use | £606.29k |
People

215 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 October 1982: Standard registration
- SHAW (Working name)
- AZURE CHARITABLE ENTERPRISES (Previous name)
- SHELTERED HOUSING AND WORKSHOPS (S H A W ) PROJECT (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chrisopher Vaulks | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Boyle | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Charlton | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Moiser | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Julie Wake | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin James Adams | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL HINDLE | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM ROBSON | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM PALMER BARNARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.22m | £8.38m | £8.77m | £8.88m | £9.22m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.32m | £7.87m | £8.03m | £8.48m | £8.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.66m | £3.82m | £3.19m | £4.23m | £4.58m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £149.41k | £244.38k | £150.39k | £167.74k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £44.30k | £13.77k | £6.49k | £11.88k | £21.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.92m | £3.85m | £4.21m | £3.89m | £4.08m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.21m | £4.51m | £4.55m | £4.98m | £5.12m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £87 | £10 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £45.23k | £0 | £105 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.59m | £4.52m | £4.61m | £5.07m | £5.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.74m | £3.30m | £3.42m | £3.41m | £3.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £37.81k | £37.44k | £36.50k | £65.60k | £72.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £41.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.04m | £3.13m | £3.03m | £2.98m | £2.55m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £995.00k | |
|
Other assets | £1.02m | £1.36m | £2.15m | £2.19m | £2.67m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.29m | £1.20m | £1.16m | £750.76k | £822.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 MAY 1984, 29 JULY 1992, 18 JUNE 2003 , 23 JUNE 2004 AND 24 NOVEMBER 2004, 22ND JUNE 2005, 14 JUNE 2006 AND 30 JUNE 2010 as amended on 18 Jul 2024 as amended on 05 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
4. The charity’s objects (“Objects”) are specifically restricted to the following charitable purposes: (1) To work with people who have special educational needs and/or a disability and/or who are disadvantaged (hereinafter called the “Beneficiaries”) to maximise their quality of life, life chances and personal development; (2) To provide or assist in the provision of all or any of the following services to or for the Beneficiaries; supported housing, employment (including supported employment), education and training, community integration support, counselling and any other relevant support service which may be developed.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIELDER AVENUE
CRAMLINGTON
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE23 8JT
- Phone:
- 01670733966
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window