ADVENT WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial support to the work of Christian Charites and other Christians seeking Theological training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 July 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan DOWNIE | Chair | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev ERIKA JAYNE BISCOE | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev IAN ROWLAND BISCOE | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Joshua DOWNIE | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Frazer | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
David DOWNIE | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.88k | £44.19k | £39.21k | £10.60k | £15.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.92k | £30.79k | £35.28k | £16.53k | £15.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE:- TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AID THAT SUPPORTS THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES:- 1. THE GIVING OF GIFTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ENHANCE A SENSE OF SELF WORTH. 2. PASTORAL SUPPORT IN VARIOUS COMMUNITY OUTREACH INITIATIVES. 3. CHRISTIAN SUPPORT GROUPS THAT ENCOURAGE SOCIAL INCLUSION. 4. SUPPORT FOR THOSE SEEKING TO FURTHER THEIR CHRISTIAN MINISTRY VIA EDUCATION. 5. THROUGH PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES FOR THE AID OF POVERTY RELIEF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOURNESIDE HOUSE
HURDCOTT LANE
WINTERBOURNE EARLS
SALISBURY
SP4 6HL
- Phone:
- 07931767636
- Email:
- team@adventworldwide.co.uk
- Website:
-
adventworldwide.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window