YOUTH ENTERPRISE AND EMPLOYABILITY ACADEMY

Charity number: 1182694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 June 2021 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2021 11 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 03 June 2020 11 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2020 06 December 2020 On time Download