Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY STAPLETON BRISTOL

Charity Number: 1182398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annabel Elizabeth Azeke Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Oliver Gerald McGregor Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Luke Peter Mills Hitchin Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Duncan Struthers Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
David Bate Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Pauline March Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Delia Jane Beake Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Benjamin Harding Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Diana Elizabeth Price Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Rosalind Ann Bradley Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Gwenyth Lynne Monks Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Rev Victoria Louise Wicks Trustee 07 January 2023
None on record
Deborah Mulvihill Trustee 27 May 2021
None on record
Ian Duff Serjeant Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Rev Ruth Mary Harding Trustee 30 March 2017
None on record