FLAMING BIBLE CHURCH UK NORTH LONDON

Charity number: 1181193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Working with other charities such as Young Minds Trust and Age UK through donations to support young and old people in the Uk. Assisting old and disable people with their shopping, cleaning their homes ,cancelling young boys with behavioral issues. Provide tutorial for primary, secondary and university students. Provide Music lessons for all age. Help children with education and welfare in Africa,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £29,302
Total expenditure: £25,794

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Enfield
  • Hackney
  • The Gambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sahr Marrah Chair 14 October 2018
None on record
Paul Michael Ivan Luke Trustee 14 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £3.48k £11.15k £14.63k £22.43k £29.30k
Total expenditure £2.37k £7.24k £15.31k £22.19k £25.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 August 2021 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 August 2021 369 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46 Fouracres
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN3 5DR
Phone:
07808892341