THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOURS ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1180622
Charity reporting is up to date (202 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH AGROTIS Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
REV RICHARD WATSON BA ADMT Chair 15 April 2018 None on record
Elaine Alexandra WIlson Trustee 17 October 2020
HERTFORDSHIRE COUNTY GUIDES ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Rev ANDREW FERRAR Trustee 17 November 2020 None on record
Matthew Barbrook Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
JEREMY MICHAEL HARDING Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Geoffrey Valentine Harrison Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
DOROTHY CAROL HONES Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
ELLIE MATTHEWS Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
NONITA PALMER Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
TREVOR OAKES Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Helen Elizabeth Jukes Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
ALEXANDER JOHN GREENWOOD Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
DIANE MARY NICHOLAS Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
BRUCE MICHAEL KING Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Ben WInter Trustee 17 November 2020 None on record
Dr MICHAEL EDWARD MURA Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record