Accounts and annual returns THE HILLSIDE AND ROKEBY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 February 2022 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 January 2020 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 January 2020 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required