Financial history THE HILLSIDE AND ROKEBY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £26 £35 £37 £34 £10
Total expenditure £45 £3.02k £44 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A