Trustees WALSINGHAM TRUST
Charity number: 1180690

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Right Revd Alan Stephen Hopes | Chair | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Right Rev. Peter Gwilym Collins | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Frank William Mulgrew | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Keane | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Raynes | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauretta Pilch | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN GIBBS | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Anthony Rogers | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr DAVID ANTHONY LIVESEY | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Katherine Mary Hattrell | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert John Byrne | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.