KENTON & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
District Membership of U3A (Kenton Branch) supplying adult education to the retired. This includes forming interest groups who study languages, literature, art, family history and other special interests run by its members and lectures from invited speakers. It also runs recreational activities e.g Current Affairs, Cookery, Theatre Visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
- Harrow
Governance
- 09 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Dick Nathan | Chair | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Levere | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Sassoon | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Graham Rumsey | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick Bishop BA | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Howard Goldstein B.A. | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Bennett | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anita Maund FCCA | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Spiteri | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rummer | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judith Rosalind Littman | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diana Lily O'Reardon | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Henry Kevin O'Doherty | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.04k | £6.24k | £1.45k | £8.87k | £9.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.39k | £2.10k | £5.47k | £4.82k | £5.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 SHOOTERS AVENUE
HARROW
HA3 9BQ
- Phone:
- 02036457348
- Email:
- doru3a@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window