Trustees NORTH COTSWOLD FOODBANK

Charity number: 1181310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexia Franca Monroe Chair 19 November 2016
THE HELP IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Lucy Elizabeth Deacon Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Garry Dick Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Jonathan Joseph Brown Trustee 27 November 2021
None on record
Jo Elizabeth Cooper Trustee 07 November 2020
None on record
Wayne Steven Morgan Trustee 08 August 2020
None on record
Rhian Mair Morgan Trustee 19 October 2019
None on record