CHIPPING AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY OLD PEOPLES' WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 513235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 22 July 2016 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required