Dogfen lywodraethu LIVERPOOL COMMUNITY ADVICE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 OCT 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 OCT 2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 APR 2016 as amended on 17 Mar 2020 as amended on 28 Apr 2020 as amended on 28 Apr 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF LIVERPOOL AND DISTRICT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
LIVERPOOL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.