LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE CITY OF SANCTUARY CHARITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lancaster and Morecambe City of Sanctuary objects are the relief of poverty among Refugees and Asylum Seders living in Lancaster and Morecambe by providing them with grants, items and services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 December 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean O'Neill | Chair | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Claire Chapman | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Taher-Bates | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Somayeh Roustaei | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bashar Bakhou | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Onek | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lippitt | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELIZABETH ROBERTS | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.24k | £31.33k | £21.82k | £22.47k | £12.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.17k | £26.21k | £20.23k | £20.34k | £14.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.20k | £8.37k | N/A | £3.96k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS LIVING IN LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH GRANTS, ITEMS, AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 BARTON ROAD
LANCASTER
LA1 4EN
- Phone:
- 0152432838
- Website:
-
lancasterandmorecambe.cityofsanctuary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window