THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES SILSDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 21 November 2018: Standard registration
- SILSDEN PARISH CHURCH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Anne Read | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Marcia Heath | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Spence | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Winstanley | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Wilkinson | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Connor Anderson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Geoffrey Goddard | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amelia Thorley | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Valerie Ruth Goddard | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Marie Robinson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CHARLES WHITAKER | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Towers | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven Mark Anderson | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.69k | £77.16k | £91.37k | £178.85k | £80.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.74k | £74.52k | £86.22k | £185.53k | £92.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St James Church
BRIGGATE
SILSDEN
KEIGHLEY
BD20 9JS
- Phone:
- 01535652204
- Email:
- silsdenjames@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.