SOUTHBOURNE AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 1182153
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Hayes Trustee 26 May 2021 None on record
Pamela Jean Kilby Trustee 16 December 2019 None on record
sUSAN jANE hODSON tALBOT Trustee 15 February 2020
SOUTHBOURNE DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: 5 days late
Alice Elaine Smith Trustee 09 February 2019 None on record
ROBERT JAMES HAYES Chair 14 June 2019
SOUTHBOURNE DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: 5 days late
4SIGHT VISION SUPPORT Received: On time
SOUTHBOURNE VILLAGE HALL Received: On time