Financial history AGE CONCERN SHREWSBURY

Charity number: 513269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.15k £21.36k £13.81k £3.73k £561
Total expenditure £20.33k £22.50k £12.11k £3.26k £5.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A