Accounts and annual returns 3RD MOLESEY (MATRAVERS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1181102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 February 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 February 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required