Trustees WHITWICK AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1181238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER MCDERMOTT Chair 16 October 2020
LEICESTERSHIRE LIFE EDUCATION CENTRES TRUST COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
LIFE EDUCATION EAST MIDLANDS LIMITED
Received: On time
Melanie Ann Gwinnutt Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Wendy Mills Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Barbara Jane Robb Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Derek John Read Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Phryne Dawe Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
James Lemuel Cox Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
BERYL GRACE SEAGER Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
RICHARD EDWARD COLLIER Trustee 16 May 2014
None on record