THE ROCHDALE SOCIETY OF MODEL AND EXPERIMENTAL ENGINEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further interest in engineering by the operation and maintenance of the miniature railway in Springfield Park, Rochdale. Arranging talks, activities and visits related to engineering for both Society members and members of the public, young and old alike.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 10 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John David Schofield | Chair | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norman Royds | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CORNELIUS INGHAM | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Gordon Potts | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Hilton | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Foster | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Larry Quinn | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HAYTER | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY HUME HARTLEY | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.30k | £5.42k | £13.64k | £6.44k | £11.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46k | £3.67k | £6.15k | £6.68k | £7.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MINIATURE ENGINEERING BY: A. THE OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MINIATURE RAILWAY AT SPRINGFIELD PARK, ROCHDALE; B. ENCOURAGING YOUNG PEOPLE TO PRACTICE MODEL ENGINEERING IN STEAM AND ELECTRICAL TRACTION BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION IN WORKSHOP PRACTICE AND SAFETY, AND THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF ENGINEERING; C. THE MOUNTING OF LECTURES AND EXHIBITIONS IN MINIATURE ENGINEERING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 SHAWCLOUGH WAY
ROCHDALE
OL12 7HF
- Phone:
- 01706367640
- Email:
- bobhayter_2000@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window