CANOLFAN WAUNFAWR

Charity number: 513328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.71k £13.78k £13.52k £11.85k £10.50k
Total expenditure £11.82k £11.47k £13.54k £11.99k £10.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A