FOUNDATION FOR FAMILY MEDICINE IN PALESTINE

Charity number: 1183997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide support, advice and training to clinicians, academics and others involved with the development of communication, education and training for family medicine in Palestine

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,253
Total expenditure: £8,441

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TONY LAURANCE CBE, MA Chair 01 September 2019
None on record
Dr Andrew Ferguson Trustee 01 February 2023
INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT
Received: On time
Ann Louise Kinmonth Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Gene Feder Professor Trustee 01 September 2019
HELIOS TRUST
Received: 33 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.24k £15.00k £16.84k £16.76k £8.25k
Total expenditure £16.51k £8.40k £13.56k £22.71k £8.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 CARSICK VIEW ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 3LZ
Phone:
0114 2306900