CHRISTIAN ABUNDANT LIFE MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Christian Abundant Life Ministry also known as The CALM Movement offer a wide range of services to the community, aiming to improving lives and enrich the quality of life in deprived communities. Our "Hungry Hearts" Project which sees us feeding the homeless via our surplus food bank, Motivational speaking to students in Schools, International Evangelism projects, and Community led fun events
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Abu Dhabi
- Australia
- Barbados
- Brazil
- Cyprus
- Dubai
- Ghana
- Hong Kong
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 01 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Ampah Pastor | Chair | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Ampah | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days | |
Annual return | 10 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days | |
Annual return | 10 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days | |
Annual return | 10 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1304 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1304 days | |
Annual return | 10 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1669 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1669 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH/RELIGION FOR THE OF THE PUBLIC IN COMPLETE ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF WITHIN THE CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE. IN ADDITION TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH/RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF WITHIN THE CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE THROUGH EDUCATION AND TRAINING , THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, OUTREACH WORK THROUGH PARTNERS OVERSEES FOR ORPHANS AND WIDOWS, WITH OUR INTERNATIONAL OUTREACH PROJECTS PROVIDING FOOD AND CLOTHING BANKS AS WELL AS CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. YOUTH MENTOR- SHIP WORKSHOPS WITH OUR YOUTH MENTOR PARTNERS AND YOUTH MENTOR-SHIP PROJECTS.PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND /OR DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE, INCLUDING THAT ON CHRISTIAN TEXT AND DOCTRINES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH/ RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VALE COMMUNITY CENTRE
PENTLAND ROAD
LONDON
NW6 5RT
- Phone:
- 07342788590
- Email:
- calm@minister.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window