THE SOMERTON LIBRARY TRUST

Charity number: 1181508

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raymond John Thompson Trustee 17 May 2021
SOMERTON RECREATION GROUND TRUST Received: On time
THE SOMERTON CHURCH LANDS Received: On time
Robert John Cherry Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record
Christine Rae McEwan Trustee 22 November 2018 None on record
Jeremy Peter Spencer Greenop OBE Chair 09 November 2018 None on record
Sheila Taylor Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Susan Margaret Partington Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record
Martyn Geoffrey Smith Trustee 09 November 2018 None on record