THE DOVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Christian religion by such legally charitable means as the Trustees shall in their discretion think fit in Formby near Liverpool and the area around it and in furtherance of these objects to:- 1. To provide youth clubs and constructive activities for children and young people of all faiths or none. 2. To assist in their development as individuals and to foster good citizenship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sefton
Governance
- 13 January 1983: Standard registration
- THE DOVE (Working name)
- THE DOVE CENTRE (Working name)
- THE DOVE'S NEST (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Murray | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEVE GINN | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Nicola Mary Wilson | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Firth | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAURIE REDGEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.09k | £8.84k | £8.72k | £17.01k | £23.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.46k | £8.72k | £8.75k | £16.08k | £14.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 APRIL 2003 AND 6 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT IN FORMBY NEAR LIVERPOOL AND THE AREA AROUND IT AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS TO: 1. PROVIDE YOUTH CLUBS AND CONSTRUCTIVE ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL FAITHS OR NONE, WITHIN FORMBY AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT. 2. TO ASSIST IN THEIR DEVELOPMENT AS INDIVIDUALS AND TO FOSTER GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE.
Area of benefit
FORMBY NEAR LIVERPOOL AND THE AREA AROUND
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dove Trust
Kirklake Road
LIVERPOOL
L37 2JF
- Phone:
- 01704871783
- Email:
- doveyouth@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window