THE PEMBERTON EDWARD'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aim is to purchase properties and then using local authority rates lease these back to the councils at affordable rents. Helping to reduce the housing shortage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Pemberton | Chair | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Davis | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Vella-Bone | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2023 | 719 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2023 | 719 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING HOUSING AND OTHER ACCOMMODATION AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR POOR PEOPLE OR PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN EACH CASE ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkeley Suite
35 Berkeley Square
Mayfair
London
W1J 5BF
- Phone:
- 02031058797
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window