THE FRESH REPUBLIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit the prevention or relief of poverty by offering financial support to charitable projects and organisations anywhere in the world and in particular but not exclusively those with a focus on children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ethical FMCG Ltd | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £1.16k | £559 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 929 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2022 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1294 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 May 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY OFFERING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO CHARITABLE PROJECTS AND ORGANISATIONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WITH A FOCUS ON CHILDREN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fresh Republic Foundation
c/o Sunfresh Produce Ltd
Bicker Bar
Boston
Lincolnshire
PE20 3AN
- Phone:
- 01775766400
- Email:
- hr@sunfreshproduce.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window