BOXFORD HISTORY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the residents of the civil parish of Boxford, West Berkshire and its adjoining parishes, the charity researches and provides information about local heritage, including archaeological excavations, exhibitions, talks and guided walks; as well as free admission to heritage assets, artefacts, photographs and records. The involvement of local schools and colleges is welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 05 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN JOY APPLETON | Chair | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Philip Brown | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Tebble | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Frederick Hayward | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Peter Fawcett | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Willison | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Swinburn Appleton | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harris Dr | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.14k | £67 | £42 | £604 | £441 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.06k | £23.24k | £1.13k | £5.20k | £3.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF BOXFORD, WEST BERKSHIRE AND ITS NEIGHBOURING PARISHES HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE PARISH"; FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT LOCAL HERITAGE INCLUDING ARCHAEOLOGY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY LEADING ARCHAEOLOGICAL EXCAVATIONS IN THE PARISH, ARRANGING HERITAGE TALKS, EXHIBITIONS AND GUIDED WALKS IN THE PARISH, PROVIDING FREE ADMISSION TO BHP HERITAGE ASSETS, ARTEFACTS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND RECORDS, PARTICULARLY TO LOCAL SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES AND PROVIDING ACTIVITIES THAT AID INDIVIDUAL RESEARCH CAPABILITIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING LOCAL AND FAMILY HISTORY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
APPLEDENE
SCHOOL LANE
BOXFORD
NEWBURY
RG20 8DX
- Phone:
- 01488608422
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window