Financial history EVESHAM ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £97.00k £115.73k £139.52k £136.18k £106.00k
Total expenditure £86.00k £115.53k £130.18k £139.68k £96.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £1.00k £1.00k £40.00k