FILEY LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold on trust monies raised by the members of Filey Lions Club. The charity undertakes a number of community service and welfare activities mainly for the benefit of people living in Filey and the surrounding villages. Grants & donations from the charity's funds are made to individuals and other voluntary groups as well as to Lions International to assist with projects on a global basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 February 1983: Standard registration
- 25 March 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1175270 FILEY LIONS CLUB
- FILEY LIONS (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.08k | £20.72k | £38.15k | £32.75k | £35.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.50k | £23.60k | £36.36k | £31.97k | £39.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | £1.60k | £0 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 13 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 13 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 13 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 13 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 17 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 17 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 25 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JANUARY 1983
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN AND WITHIN THE AREA FROM TIME TO TIME COMPRISING THE TERRITORIAL AREA OF THE CLUB THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF EIRE OR ELSEWHERE AND/OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES TRUST ASSOCIATIONS INSTITITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED OR ABOUT TO BE ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB SHALL IN ITSABN SUCH MANNERS AS THE CLUB SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window