Accounts and annual returns DASH (DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS HUDDERSFIELD)

Charity number: 1181825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 1 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window