Accounts and annual returns BOAT BUILDING ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1187235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window