Accounts and annual returns HEAD OUTDOORS

Charity number: 1186181
Charity reporting is overdue by 735 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 26 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 23 April 2023 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 06 June 2022 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 735 days