KEIGHLEY LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All monies raised for our charity account is used to help people in need. People needing financial assistance also other organisations at home and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bradford City
Governance
- 21 April 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Walters | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Valentine | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Ogden | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN VERITY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.22k | £9.50k | £6.92k | £11.00k | £11.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.22k | £9.50k | £6.92k | £11.00k | £11.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 OCTOBER 1982.
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME ARISING THEREFROM OR ANY PARTS OR PARTS THEREOF FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN AND WITHIN THE AREA FROM TIME TO TIME COMPRISING THE TERRITORIAL AREA OF THE CLUB, THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF EIRE OR ELSEWHERE AND/OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE TRUSTS ASSOCIATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNERS AS THE CLUB SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND SELECT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF EIRE OF ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 SQUIRE LANE
BRADFORD
BD8 9PS
- Phone:
- 01274493460
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window