Accounts and annual returns LEUKAEMIA CARE

Charity number: 1183890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required